OK SB1124 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Pain management clinics; providing for regulation of clinics. Effective date.
Title
Pain management clinics; providing for regulation of clinics. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ervin Yen [R] | Rep. Dale Derby [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Derby (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 1000 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |