OK SB1122 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Transportation; setting budgetary limitations. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Department of Transportation; setting budgetary limitations. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Motion expired |
2013-05-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sanders |
2013-05-22 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 28 |
2013-05-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby |
2013-05-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3 |
2013-05-22 | House | JCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | General Order |
2013-05-16 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2013-05-15 | House | First Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Emergency added |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2013-05-01 | Senate | coauthored by Newell |
2013-05-01 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | coauthored by Justice |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2013-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |