OK SB1115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement Board; deleting requirement for COLA assumption. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement Board; deleting requirement for COLA assumption. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: COLA DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: COLA DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 28 |
2013-04-15 | House | General Order |
2013-03-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy) |
2013-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Pensions committee; CR filed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Moore (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text |