OK SB1103 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - coauthored by Standridge
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - coauthored by Standridge
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cigarette tax; limiting certain amounts apportioned after specified date; providing for deposit of funds in excess of limit. Effective date.
Title
Cigarette tax; limiting certain amounts apportioned after specified date; providing for deposit of funds in excess of limit. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2016-02-22 | Senate | coauthored by Casey (principal House author) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1103&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1103%20INT.PDF |