OK SB1103 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - CCR read, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - CCR read, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Teachers' Retirement System; modifying definition of certain compensation. Effective date.
Title
Teachers' Retirement System; modifying definition of certain compensation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-08 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-05-02 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2013-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-17 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-16 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-16 | House | Amended |
2013-04-16 | House | General Order |
2013-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Pensions committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |