OK SB1099 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1099
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Small wireless networks; requiring certain repairs. Effective date.
Title
Small wireless networks; requiring certain repairs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1099 (Carry Over) 2023-04-13 - CR; Do Pass Rules Committee