OK SB1088 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; making certain income tax credits transferable; establishing procedures relating to transfer of credits. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; making certain income tax credits transferable; establishing procedures relating to transfer of credits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 6 | |
2009-03-11 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Jordan | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |