OK SB1084 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Proctor (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Proctor (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highway designations; designating the Sergeant Jeffrey Lee Drake Memorial Highway. Effective date.
Title
Memorial highway designations; designating the Sergeant Jeffrey Lee Drake Memorial Highway. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Proctor (principal House author) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dossett |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |