OK SB1083 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporate liability; providing certain protections to members and managers of limited liability companies. Effective date.
Title
Corporate liability; providing certain protections to members and managers of limited liability companies. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Jordan [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 26 |
2013-04-16 | House | General Order |
2013-04-03 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |