OK SB1082 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Deferred Deposit Lending Act; making certain information confidential. Emergency.
Title
Deferred Deposit Lending Act; making certain information confidential. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 17 | |
2012-04-16 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-15 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Dorman (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Ballenger | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |