OK SB1077 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Attorneys' lien; creating certain notice procedures; requiring certain action to be commenced within specified time period.
Title
Attorneys' lien; creating certain notice procedures; requiring certain action to be commenced within specified time period.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Randon Grau [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 6 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |