OK SB1073 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Civil procedure; modifying various provisions. Effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; modifying various provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13 | |
2010-05-24 | 3 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | 3 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-19 | 3 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-12 | 3 CCR read | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Sullivan, Duncan, McCullough, Kiesel, Buck | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named Crain, Anderson, Sykes, Jolley, Paddack | |
2010-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-05-19 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-14 | SCs changed Crain, Anderson, Sykes, Paddack to Crain, Anderson, Sykes, Jolley, Paddack | |
2009-05-14 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2009-05-13 | CCR rejected, further conference requested | |
2009-05-12 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-12 | Title restored | |
2009-05-12 | CCR read | |
2009-04-30 | SCs named Crain, Anderson, Sykes, Paddack | |
2009-04-29 | Conference granted, HC's named Sullivan, Duncan, McCullough, Jordan, Morrissette, Kiesel | |
2009-04-22 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-15 | HAs read | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6 | |
2009-04-14 | General Order | |
2009-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1173 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 1173 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1183 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 1190 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 139 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 1554 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 1764 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 706 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 842 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 936 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 152 | New Code | See Bill Text |