OK SB1070 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Solicitation of Charitable Contributions Act; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Solicitation of Charitable Contributions Act; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 28 | |
2010-05-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy) | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-10 | Conference granted, HC's named Peters, McNiel, Denney, Lamons, Shumate | |
2010-04-28 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-27 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 35 | |
2010-04-21 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-21 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-21 | Reconsider adoption of floor substitute | |
2010-04-21 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-04-12 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilliard | |
2010-04-12 | Remove Representative Hilliard as principal House author and substitute with Representative Peters | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-23 | Withdrawn from Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2009-03-09 | First Reading | |
2009-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Hilliard (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-20 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hilliard | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 552 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 12 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 14 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 14a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 17 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 18 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 1a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 552 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |