OK SB1068 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; modifying carry forward period for credits for investment in property or new jobs. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; modifying carry forward period for credits for investment in property or new jobs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Quinn |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |