OK SB1066 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1066
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redistricting; creating the State Senate Redistricting Act of 2021.
Title
Redistricting; creating the State Senate Redistricting Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: State and Federal Redistricting Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Redistricting: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: State and Federal Redistricting Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Redistricting: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/13/2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2021-05-12 | House | General Order |
2021-05-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Martinez |
2021-05-06 | House | CR; Do Pass State and Federal Redistricting Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Second Reading referred to State and Federal Redistricting |
2021-05-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Redistricting committee; CR filed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Select Committee on Redistricting |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1066 (Carry Over) 2021-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2021