OK SB1061 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alarm and locksmiths; prohibiting automatic renewal of certain contracts; customer rights. Effective date.
Title
Alarm and locksmiths; prohibiting automatic renewal of certain contracts; customer rights. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 8 |
2018-04-17 | House | General Order |
2018-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1800 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1800 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1800 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |