OK SB106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB106
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Arts Council; creating the Cultural Districts Initiative Act. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Arts Council; creating the Cultural Districts Initiative Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Kirt [D] | Rep. Judd Strom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kirt |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB106 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Title stricken