OK SB106 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB106

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Arts Council; creating the Cultural Districts Initiative Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Arts Council; creating the Cultural Districts Initiative Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-13SenateEngrossed to House
2020-02-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-02-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2020-02-12SenateTitle restored
2020-02-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Kirt
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB106 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Title stricken

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback