OK SB1058 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Consumer sales and loans; authorizing debtor or creditor to initiate refund or credit. Effective date.
Title
Consumer sales and loans; authorizing debtor or creditor to initiate refund or credit. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-05-06 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | House | General Order |
2013-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Ortega (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |