OK SB1043 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Water discharge permits. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Water discharge permits. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Approved by Governor 04/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-10 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-05 | General Order | |
2012-03-28 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-15 | coauthored by Fields | |
2012-03-15 | Emergency added | |
2012-03-15 | Title restored | |
2012-03-15 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Energy | |
2012-02-14 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 1020 | 9A | New Code | See Bill Text |