OK SB1036 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School personnel; relating to Open Records Act; exempting certain names from disclosure of carrying firearms. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School personnel; relating to Open Records Act; exempting certain names from disclosure of carrying firearms. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Sen. Jason Smalley [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/04/2016 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 11 |
2016-04-04 | House | General Order |
2016-03-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern |
2016-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-02-15 | Senate | coauthored by Coody (Jeff) (principal House author) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1280 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 5 | 149 | New Code | See Bill Text |