OK SB1030 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State Medicaid program; directing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to seek certain waiver. Effective date.
Title
State Medicaid program; directing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to seek certain waiver. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 17 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |