OK SB1016 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public buildings; providing for display of national motto in certain public buildings. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings; providing for display of national motto in certain public buildings. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-03-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-19SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
2018-03-15SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2018-03-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-28Senatecoauthored by Strohm
2018-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
2018-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Shaw
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback