OK SB1013 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Bail Enforcement and Licensing Act; modifying provisions relating to licensing and regulation. Effective date.
Title
Bail Enforcement and Licensing Act; modifying provisions relating to licensing and regulation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 7 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [FAIL]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 7 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [FAIL]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 4 |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 56 Nays: 4 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-08 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Shortey, Newberry, Treat, Allen, Paddack, Shumate |
2013-05-06 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 17 |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-03 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Joyner (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shortey |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1332 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1350 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1750 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1750 | 2A | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1750 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |