OK SB101 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Bail bondsmen; eligibility for licensure; allowing certain ABLE Commission license. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail bondsmen; eligibility for licensure; allowing certain ABLE Commission license. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-04SenateApproved by Governor 05/01/2015
2015-04-28SenateSent to Governor
2015-04-28HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-04-28SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-04-27SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-04-27SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3
2015-04-27SenateHAs adopted
2015-04-14SenateHAs read
2015-04-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 11
2015-04-13HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2015-02-25HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-25SenateEngrossed to House
2015-02-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-02-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2015-02-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-02-12SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2015-02-09Senatecoauthored by Bennett
2015-02-09Senatecoauthored by Osborn (principal House author)
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5913151Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb101&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB101%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB101%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB101%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB101%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB101%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB101%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB101%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB101_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB101_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback