OK SB101 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Vetoed 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Vetoed 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Mental health; establishing the Task Force on State Services for Adults with Asperger's Syndrome and Autism. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Mental health; establishing the Task Force on State Services for Adults with Asperger's Syndrome and Autism. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Vetoed 05/06/2013 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Veto message read |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2013-04-25 | House | General Order |
2013-04-17 | House | Published on Consent Docket |
2013-03-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Human Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Enns (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |