OK SB101 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sales tax; modifying definition relating to requirement to obtain certain special events sales tax permit. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax; modifying definition relating to requirement to obtain certain special events sales tax permit. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-21 | coauthored by Cannaday (principal House author) | |
2011-02-21 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Ballenger | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |