OK SB1002 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1002

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rural broadband expansion; Rural Broadband Expansion Council; membership; appointees. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural broadband expansion; Rural Broadband Expansion Council; membership; appointees. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITH EMERGENCY (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2020-05-22HouseTo Senate
2020-05-22HouseVeto overridden: Ayes: 91 Nays: 7
2020-05-22HouseVeto override message received
2020-05-22SenateMeasure sent to House
2020-05-22SenateVeto overridden: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2020-05-19SenateVetoed 05/19/2020
2020-05-15SenateSent to Governor
2020-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2020-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
2020-05-15SenateHAs adopted
2020-05-14SenateHAs read
2020-05-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-05-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-05-14HouseEmergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2020-05-14HouseRecall from engrossment
2020-05-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-05-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2020-05-14HouseEmergency added
2020-05-14HouseTitle restored
2020-05-14HouseAmended by floor substitute
2020-05-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Roe, Lawson
2020-05-14HouseRemove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
2020-05-14HouseGeneral Order
2020-05-04HouseWithdrawn from Utilities, Direct to Calendar
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Utilities
2019-03-26HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
2019-03-14SenateTitle stricken
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB1002 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Utilities

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1002&Session=2000
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB1002%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB1002%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB1002%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB1002%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1002%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB1002%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1002_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1002_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback