OK SB1002 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1002
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Corporation Commission; creating the Facilitating Internet Broadband Rural Expansion Act; establishing duties of certain cooperatives. Effective date.
Title
Corporation Commission; creating the Facilitating Internet Broadband Rural Expansion Act; establishing duties of certain cooperatives. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Utilities |
2019-03-26 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1002 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Utilities