OK SB1000 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1000
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; authorizing OSBI to take certain actions with sexual assault evidence kits. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; authorizing OSBI to take certain actions with sexual assault evidence kits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Steve Bashore [R] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Fugate |
2023-04-20 | House | General Order |
2023-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bashore (principal House author) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1000 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023