OK HR1046 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; Oklahoma Agriculture Day; March 24, 2022; directing distribution.
Title
Resolution; Oklahoma Agriculture Day; March 24, 2022; directing distribution.
Sponsors
Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2022-03-24 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2022-03-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader |
2022-03-24 | House | Considered |
2022-03-07 | House | Authored by Representative Kerbs |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced |