OK HR1031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; Oklahoma Agriculture Day; April 16, 2024; directing distribution.
Title
Resolution; Oklahoma Agriculture Day; April 16, 2024; directing distribution.
Sponsors
Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2024-04-16 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | House | Considered |
2024-03-14 | House | Authored by Representative Kerbs |
2024-03-14 | House | Introduced |