OK HR1022 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-1)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-1)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rose Day; recoginizeing February 7, 2018 as Rose Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Rose Day; recoginizeing February 7, 2018 as Rose Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] |
Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. Todd Thomsen [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] |
Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Rep. Glen Mulready [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] |
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. David Perryman [D] |
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. Travis Dunlap [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Greg Babinec [R] |
Rep. Dale Derby [R] | Rep. Tim Downing [R] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Rep. Roger Ford [R] |
Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Rep. Rick West [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Zack Taylor [R] |
Rep. Tammy West [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2018-02-07 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2018-02-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kannady, Enns, Ford (Roger), Osborn (Leslie), Dunlap, McCall, Wright, Fetgatter, Kerbs, West (Rick), Moore, Hilbert, Echols, Coody, West (Kevin), Faught, Taylor, Casey, Sears, Downing, Humphrey, Babinec, Cleveland, Russ, Bennett (John), Jordan, McBride, ODonnell, Murdock, Wallace, Thomsen, Gann, Derby, Perryman, Murphey, Frix, Mulready, Hall, McDaniel |
2018-02-07 | House | Considered |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Ritze |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced |