OK HJR1127 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
A Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission; distribution.
Title
A Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission; distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 | |
2012-05-24 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-05-17 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-05-09 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-05-08 | First Reading | |
2012-05-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-07 | General Order | |
2012-05-02 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2012-05-02 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-24 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-04-23 | Authored by Representative Jordan | |
2012-04-23 | First Reading |