OK HJR1124 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: CLEET DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-07 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2012-05-24 Approved by Governor 05/24/2012
2012-05-21 Sent to Governor
2012-05-21 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-21 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-18 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-18 Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-18 Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
2012-05-18 General Order, Considered
2012-05-17 Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2012-05-14 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2012-05-10 First Reading
2012-05-10 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-05-09 Referred for engrossment
2012-05-09 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
2012-05-09 Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author)
2012-05-09 General Order
2012-04-25 CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee
2012-04-18 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2012-04-17 Authored by Representative Thomsen
2012-04-17 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback