OK HJR1123 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Insurance Department of the State of Oklahoma; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Insurance Department of the State of Oklahoma; distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by Governor 05/22/2012 | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-17 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2012-05-17 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-05-15 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-05-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-05-07 | First Reading | |
2012-05-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-03 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2012-05-03 | General Order | |
2012-04-25 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-18 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-04-17 | Authored by Representative Faught | |
2012-04-17 | First Reading |