OK HJR1112 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the State Board of Cosmetology; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the State Board of Cosmetology; distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Approved by Governor 05/21/2012 | |
2012-05-15 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-14 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-14 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2012-05-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-30 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-04-19 | First Reading | |
2012-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-18 | Authored by Senator Ivester (principal Senate author) | |
2012-04-18 | General Order | |
2012-04-11 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-04-03 | Authored by Representative McPeak | |
2012-04-03 | First Reading |