OK HJR1107 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Joint Resolution approving permanent rule of the Department of Wildlife Conservation; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution approving permanent rule of the Department of Wildlife Conservation; distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-12 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 49 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-07 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2012-05-22 Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
2012-05-17 Sent to Governor
2012-05-17 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-17 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-16 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-16 Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-16 Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 3
2012-05-16 General Order, Considered
2012-05-15 Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2012-04-17 Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
2012-04-16 First Reading
2012-04-16 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-12 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-12 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7
2012-04-12 Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 67 Nays: 3
2012-04-10 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Vaughan
2012-04-10 Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 49 Nays: 37
2012-04-10 General Order
2012-04-04 Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
2012-04-04 CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee
2012-03-26 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2012-03-21 Authored by Representative Vaughan
2012-03-21 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback