OK HJR1059 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Resolving clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Resolving clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; requiring certain majority vote of the people to pass constitutional amendments; ballot title; filing.
Title
Constitutional amendment; requiring certain majority vote of the people to pass constitutional amendments; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Resolving clause stricken |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 19 |
2022-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-22 | House | Amended |
2022-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Newton, Caldwell (Chad), CrosswhiteHader |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |