OK HJR1027 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; changing the percentage of legal voters from statewide to every congressional district of the state for certain petitions; ballot title; filing.
Title
Constitutional amendment; changing the percentage of legal voters from statewide to every congressional district of the state for certain petitions; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 30 |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Burns, Humphrey, Roberts (Dustin) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |