OK HJR1018 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax checkoff; allowing taxpayer to designate portion of tax liability into fund; creating the Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management Disaster Response Revolving Fund. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax checkoff; allowing taxpayer to designate portion of tax liability into fund; creating the Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management Disaster Response Revolving Fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Corn (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bailey | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2368 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
ART 10 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |