OK HJR1017 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR1017
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Constitution; Article V Constitutional Conventions; procedures; filing.
Title
Oklahoma Constitution; Article V Constitutional Conventions; procedures; filing.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Cody Maynard [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Rules: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Rules: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Filed with Secretary of State |
2023-05-01 | House | Returned by Governor (4/28/2023) |
2023-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21 |
2023-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Maynard |
2023-03-22 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1017 (Carry Over) 2023-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State