OK HJR1017 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR1017
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Dahm
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Dahm
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution; providing for the transfer of monies held in the Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund; providing that certain monies received be directed to the Community and Regional Empowerment Fund; creating fund; creating Board of Directors; ballot title; directing filing.
Title
Joint Resolution; providing for the transfer of monies held in the Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund; providing that certain monies received be directed to the Community and Regional Empowerment Fund; creating fund; creating Board of Directors; ballot title; directing filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Dahm |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 27 |
2019-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-11 | House | Amended |
2019-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1017 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee