OK HJR1017 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional Convention; calling an Oklahoma Constitutional Convention.
Title
Constitutional Convention; calling an Oklahoma Constitutional Convention.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Susan Paddack [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-12 | Conference granted, SCs named Paddack, Coffee, Lamb | |
2009-05-06 | HC's named: Banz, Trebilcock, Steele, Brannon, Dorman, Blackwell, Jackson | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-20 | SA's received | |
2009-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | |
2009-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 27 | |
2009-03-10 | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-10 | General Order | |
2009-02-05 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Banz | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |