OK HJR1011 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Constitution; budget procedures; expenditure limitations; ballot title; filing.
Title
Oklahoma Constitution; budget procedures; expenditure limitations; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |