OK HJR1002 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Constitution; allowing direct shipment of wine to certain individuals; ballot title; filing.
Title
Oklahoma Constitution; allowing direct shipment of wine to certain individuals; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Died in conference |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named David, Justice, Bice, Jolley, Crain, Floyd, Dossett |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2016-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion expired |
2015-03-09 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Kirby |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 37 |
2015-03-09 | House | Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | House Rule suspended |
2015-03-09 | House | Considered |
2015-03-04 | House | Laid over |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Kirby |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |