OK HCR1048 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Congratulations; supporting Nation of Israel and congratulating Israel on sixty-second anniversary of its founding.
Title
Congratulations; supporting Nation of Israel and congratulating Israel on sixty-second anniversary of its founding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - House - House: (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2010-05-05 | coauthored by all other Senators | |
2010-05-05 | Considered | |
2010-05-05 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-04-19 | First Reading | |
2010-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-15 | Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-15 | Amended | |
2010-04-15 | Authored by Senator Adelson (principal Senate author) | |
2010-04-15 | Coauthored by all other Representatives | |
2010-04-15 | Considered | |
2010-02-18 | Authored by Representative Wesselhoft | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced |