OK HCR1041 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Urging Congress to repeal the federal estate tax or set certain exclusion amounts and tax rates.
Title
Urging Congress to repeal the federal estate tax or set certain exclusion amounts and tax rates.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] |
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Rex Duncan [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Mike Thompson [R] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-15 - House - House: (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-19 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2009-05-19 | Considered | |
2009-05-19 | Direct to Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | First Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-15 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2009-05-15 | Ayes: 81 Nays: 8 | |
2009-05-15 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2009-05-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn, Cox, Denney, Thompson, Duncan, Tibbs, Billy | |
2009-05-15 | Considered | |
2009-05-13 | Authored by Representative Coody | |
2009-05-13 | Introduced |