OK HCR1027 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-15)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-15)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Opposing proposed federal legislation, S. 787, known as the Clean Water Restoration Act.
Title
Opposing proposed federal legislation, S. 787, known as the Clean Water Restoration Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-19 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2009-05-19 | coauthored by all other Senators except Wilson, Adelson, Lerblance, Paddack, Corn, Gumm, Johnson (Constance), Eason McIntyre | |
2009-05-19 | Considered | |
2009-05-19 | Direct to Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | First Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-04 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2009-05-04 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2009-05-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey, McCullough, Kern, Ritze | |
2009-05-04 | Considered | |
2009-04-29 | Authored by Representative Enns, Dank | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced |