OK HCR1014 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-10-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution increasing awareness of Alzheimer's disease and other dementias; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution increasing awareness of Alzheimer's disease and other dementias; distribution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2018-03-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-03-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-03-21HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-03-21SenateAdopted, returned to House
2018-03-21SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2018-03-21SenateConsidered
2018-03-21SenateDirect to Calendar
2018-03-21SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2018-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-13HouseAdopted, referred for engrossment
2018-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
2018-03-13HouseConsidered
2018-03-08HouseAuthored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-08HouseAuthored by Representative Munson
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback